|
10/12/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 709, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/27/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3538.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3535.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2017
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3533.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3002.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2861.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 5. Page 1962.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|