California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB755 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Bill No. 755 CHAPTER 709 An act to amend Section 51298.5 of the Government Code, relating to economic development. [ Approved by Governor October 12, 2017. Filed with Secretary of State October 12, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 755, Eduardo Garcia. Local agencies: capital investment incentive program.Existing law, until January 1, 2018, authorizes a county, city and county, or city to establish a capital investment incentive program, pursuant to which the county, city and county, or city is authorized to pay a capital investment incentive amount to the proponent of a qualified manufacturing facility for up to 15 consecutive years.This bill would extend that authorization to January 1, 2019.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 51298.5 of the Government Code is amended to read:51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.
1+Enrolled September 19, 2017 Passed IN Senate September 15, 2017 Passed IN Assembly September 16, 2017 Amended IN Senate September 07, 2017 Amended IN Assembly May 30, 2017 Amended IN Assembly April 24, 2017 Amended IN Assembly March 23, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 755Introduced by Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia(Principal coauthor: Senator Hueso)February 15, 2017 An act to amend Section 51298.5 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 755, Eduardo Garcia. Local agencies: capital investment incentive program.Existing law, until January 1, 2018, authorizes a county, city and county, or city to establish a capital investment incentive program, pursuant to which the county, city and county, or city is authorized to pay a capital investment incentive amount to the proponent of a qualified manufacturing facility for up to 15 consecutive years.This bill would extend that authorization to January 1, 2019.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 51298.5 of the Government Code is amended to read:51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.
22
3- Assembly Bill No. 755 CHAPTER 709 An act to amend Section 51298.5 of the Government Code, relating to economic development. [ Approved by Governor October 12, 2017. Filed with Secretary of State October 12, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 755, Eduardo Garcia. Local agencies: capital investment incentive program.Existing law, until January 1, 2018, authorizes a county, city and county, or city to establish a capital investment incentive program, pursuant to which the county, city and county, or city is authorized to pay a capital investment incentive amount to the proponent of a qualified manufacturing facility for up to 15 consecutive years.This bill would extend that authorization to January 1, 2019.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
3+ Enrolled September 19, 2017 Passed IN Senate September 15, 2017 Passed IN Assembly September 16, 2017 Amended IN Senate September 07, 2017 Amended IN Assembly May 30, 2017 Amended IN Assembly April 24, 2017 Amended IN Assembly March 23, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 755Introduced by Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia(Principal coauthor: Senator Hueso)February 15, 2017 An act to amend Section 51298.5 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 755, Eduardo Garcia. Local agencies: capital investment incentive program.Existing law, until January 1, 2018, authorizes a county, city and county, or city to establish a capital investment incentive program, pursuant to which the county, city and county, or city is authorized to pay a capital investment incentive amount to the proponent of a qualified manufacturing facility for up to 15 consecutive years.This bill would extend that authorization to January 1, 2019.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled September 19, 2017 Passed IN Senate September 15, 2017 Passed IN Assembly September 16, 2017 Amended IN Senate September 07, 2017 Amended IN Assembly May 30, 2017 Amended IN Assembly April 24, 2017 Amended IN Assembly March 23, 2017
6+
7+Enrolled September 19, 2017
8+Passed IN Senate September 15, 2017
9+Passed IN Assembly September 16, 2017
10+Amended IN Senate September 07, 2017
11+Amended IN Assembly May 30, 2017
12+Amended IN Assembly April 24, 2017
13+Amended IN Assembly March 23, 2017
14+
15+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
416
517 Assembly Bill No. 755
6-CHAPTER 709
18+
19+Introduced by Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia(Principal coauthor: Senator Hueso)February 15, 2017
20+
21+Introduced by Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia(Principal coauthor: Senator Hueso)
22+February 15, 2017
723
824 An act to amend Section 51298.5 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.
9-
10- [ Approved by Governor October 12, 2017. Filed with Secretary of State October 12, 2017. ]
1125
1226 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1327
1428 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1529
1630 AB 755, Eduardo Garcia. Local agencies: capital investment incentive program.
1731
1832 Existing law, until January 1, 2018, authorizes a county, city and county, or city to establish a capital investment incentive program, pursuant to which the county, city and county, or city is authorized to pay a capital investment incentive amount to the proponent of a qualified manufacturing facility for up to 15 consecutive years.This bill would extend that authorization to January 1, 2019.
1933
2034 Existing law, until January 1, 2018, authorizes a county, city and county, or city to establish a capital investment incentive program, pursuant to which the county, city and county, or city is authorized to pay a capital investment incentive amount to the proponent of a qualified manufacturing facility for up to 15 consecutive years.
2135
2236 This bill would extend that authorization to January 1, 2019.
2337
2438 ## Digest Key
2539
2640 ## Bill Text
2741
2842 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 51298.5 of the Government Code is amended to read:51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.
2943
3044 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3145
3246 ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3347
3448 SECTION 1. Section 51298.5 of the Government Code is amended to read:51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.
3549
3650 SECTION 1. Section 51298.5 of the Government Code is amended to read:
3751
3852 ### SECTION 1.
3953
4054 51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.
4155
4256 51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.
4357
4458 51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.
4559
4660
4761
4862 51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.
4963
5064 (b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.