California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB755 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/19/2017

                    Enrolled  September 19, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 15, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 16, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  September 07, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  May 30, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 24, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  March 23, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 755Introduced by Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia(Principal coauthor: Senator Hueso)February 15, 2017 An act to amend Section 51298.5 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 755, Eduardo Garcia. Local agencies: capital investment incentive program.Existing law, until January 1, 2018, authorizes a county, city and county, or city to establish a capital investment incentive program, pursuant to which the county, city and county, or city is authorized to pay a capital investment incentive amount to the proponent of a qualified manufacturing facility for up to 15 consecutive years.This bill would extend that authorization to January 1, 2019.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 51298.5 of the Government Code is amended to read:51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.

 Enrolled  September 19, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 15, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 16, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  September 07, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  May 30, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 24, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  March 23, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 755Introduced by Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia(Principal coauthor: Senator Hueso)February 15, 2017 An act to amend Section 51298.5 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 755, Eduardo Garcia. Local agencies: capital investment incentive program.Existing law, until January 1, 2018, authorizes a county, city and county, or city to establish a capital investment incentive program, pursuant to which the county, city and county, or city is authorized to pay a capital investment incentive amount to the proponent of a qualified manufacturing facility for up to 15 consecutive years.This bill would extend that authorization to January 1, 2019.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  September 19, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 15, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 16, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  September 07, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  May 30, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 24, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  March 23, 2017

Enrolled  September 19, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  September 15, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  September 16, 2017
Amended IN  Senate  September 07, 2017
Amended IN  Assembly  May 30, 2017
Amended IN  Assembly  April 24, 2017
Amended IN  Assembly  March 23, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 755

Introduced by Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia(Principal coauthor: Senator Hueso)February 15, 2017

Introduced by Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia(Principal coauthor: Senator Hueso)
February 15, 2017

 An act to amend Section 51298.5 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 755, Eduardo Garcia. Local agencies: capital investment incentive program.

Existing law, until January 1, 2018, authorizes a county, city and county, or city to establish a capital investment incentive program, pursuant to which the county, city and county, or city is authorized to pay a capital investment incentive amount to the proponent of a qualified manufacturing facility for up to 15 consecutive years.This bill would extend that authorization to January 1, 2019.

Existing law, until January 1, 2018, authorizes a county, city and county, or city to establish a capital investment incentive program, pursuant to which the county, city and county, or city is authorized to pay a capital investment incentive amount to the proponent of a qualified manufacturing facility for up to 15 consecutive years.

This bill would extend that authorization to January 1, 2019.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 51298.5 of the Government Code is amended to read:51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 51298.5 of the Government Code is amended to read:51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.

SECTION 1. Section 51298.5 of the Government Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.

51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.

51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.



51298.5. (a) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019.

(b) A capital investment incentive program established pursuant to this chapter before January 1, 2019, may remain in effect for the full term of that program, regardless of the repeal of this chapter.