|
10/13/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 748, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2450.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 1653.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|