|
10/07/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 554, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 3. Page 3124.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2337.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 966.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|