California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB789 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2017

Amended

Bill July 17, 2017
Bill June 13, 2017