California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB81 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2017

Amended

Bill September 1, 2017
Bill April 6, 2017