Senate | 06/07/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 5. Page 1425.) | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2017 | Read first time. To print. |