Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 28. Page 2057.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|