|
10/14/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 786, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3424.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2910.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1777.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Ting. To Third Reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|