California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB932 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 14, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill September 1, 2017
Bill July 19, 2017
Bill July 18, 2017
Bill July 3, 2017
Bill June 22, 2017
Bill May 23, 2017
Bill April 19, 2017
Bill March 23, 2017