|
09/01/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 202, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2229.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1618.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|