California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB938 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2017

Amended

Bill April 25, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017
Bill March 13, 2017