Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1802.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|