California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB943 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Amended

Bill July 19, 2017
Bill June 28, 2017
Bill May 25, 2017
Bill May 11, 2017
Bill May 4, 2017