Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5278.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2017
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2017
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3544.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2017
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|