Assembly | 09/12/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 09/12/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2571.) | ||
Senate | 08/30/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2792.) | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 22). | ||
Assembly | 07/20/2017 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 07/18/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/17/2017 | Introduced. To print. |