Assembly | 08/17/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5278.) | ||
Senate | 08/07/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2018 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4380.) | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2018 | Introduced. To print. |