California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR154 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/17/2018

                            Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 154 CHAPTER 145 Relative to the Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway.  [ Filed with  Secretary of State  August 17, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 154, Voepel. Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 94 in the County of San Diego as the Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Jarod Charles Dittman was born on September 6, 1979, in the City of Fargo, North Dakota and graduated from Philipsburg-Osceola High School in 1998. He later went on to graduate from Pennsylvania State University and became a member of a Civil War reenactment group, the 148th Pennsylvania Volunteer Infantry, Company C; andWHEREAS, Jarod served in the Pennsylvania Army National Guard and was later deployed to Kosovo, where he observed that the children there were in need of winter clothing. He orchestrated a drive to collect coats and boots in the United States and had them distributed throughout the countryside around Kosovo; andWHEREAS, Jarod married his wife Pavlina Dudeva on May 20, 2004, in Skopje, Macedonia. He and Pavlina had a daughter, Angela Nicole Dittman, who was born on October 27, 2006, at State College, Pennsylvania. Jarod was a loving man who considered his family his top priority; andWHEREAS, Jarod continued in his service to his country and began his career as a Border Patrol Agent for the United States Department of Homeland Security on March 5, 2007, as a member of the 660th Session of the Border Patrol Academy. He was assigned to the Brown Field Station immediately after graduation from the academy and loved his career and his fellow agents; and WHEREAS, On March 30, 2008, while Border Patrol Agent Dittman was working the midnight shift, he was involved in a single vehicle rollover accident at approximately 1:00 a.m. in the morning when he was en route to his assigned work area from the Brown Field Station. Agent Dittman was found by another border patrol agent after he had been ejected from his service vehicle; andWHEREAS, Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman was 28 years of age at the time of his death and is survived by his wife, Pavlina, and his daughter, Angela; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Route 94 from post mile 24.50 to 29.50 in the County of San Diego as the Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the costs of erecting the appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 154 CHAPTER 145 Relative to the Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway.  [ Filed with  Secretary of State  August 17, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 154, Voepel. Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 94 in the County of San Diego as the Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES 

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 154
CHAPTER 145

 Relative to the Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway. 

 [ Filed with  Secretary of State  August 17, 2018. ] 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 154, Voepel. Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway.

This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 94 in the County of San Diego as the Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.

This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 94 in the County of San Diego as the Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Jarod Charles Dittman was born on September 6, 1979, in the City of Fargo, North Dakota and graduated from Philipsburg-Osceola High School in 1998. He later went on to graduate from Pennsylvania State University and became a member of a Civil War reenactment group, the 148th Pennsylvania Volunteer Infantry, Company C; and

WHEREAS, Jarod served in the Pennsylvania Army National Guard and was later deployed to Kosovo, where he observed that the children there were in need of winter clothing. He orchestrated a drive to collect coats and boots in the United States and had them distributed throughout the countryside around Kosovo; and

WHEREAS, Jarod married his wife Pavlina Dudeva on May 20, 2004, in Skopje, Macedonia. He and Pavlina had a daughter, Angela Nicole Dittman, who was born on October 27, 2006, at State College, Pennsylvania. Jarod was a loving man who considered his family his top priority; and

WHEREAS, Jarod continued in his service to his country and began his career as a Border Patrol Agent for the United States Department of Homeland Security on March 5, 2007, as a member of the 660th Session of the Border Patrol Academy. He was assigned to the Brown Field Station immediately after graduation from the academy and loved his career and his fellow agents; and 

WHEREAS, On March 30, 2008, while Border Patrol Agent Dittman was working the midnight shift, he was involved in a single vehicle rollover accident at approximately 1:00 a.m. in the morning when he was en route to his assigned work area from the Brown Field Station. Agent Dittman was found by another border patrol agent after he had been ejected from his service vehicle; and

WHEREAS, Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman was 28 years of age at the time of his death and is survived by his wife, Pavlina, and his daughter, Angela; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Route 94 from post mile 24.50 to 29.50 in the County of San Diego as the Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway; and be it further

Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the costs of erecting the appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.