Assembly
|
02/22/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3344.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2018
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2018
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3923.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2018
|
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2018
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|