California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR157 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2018

Enrolled

Bill February 21, 2018

Chaptered

Bill February 22, 2018

Amended

Bill January 30, 2018
Bill January 23, 2018