California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR157 Amended / Bill

Filed 01/23/2018

                    Amended IN  Assembly  January 23, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 157Introduced by Assembly Member ChoiJanuary 18, 2018Relative to the 2018 Olympic Winter Games and Paralympic Winter Games. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 157, as amended, Choi. Olympic Winter Games and Paralympic Winter Games in South Korea.This measure would commend South Korea for hosting the XXIII Olympic Winter Games and the XII Paralympic Winter Games and offer wishes for a safe and successful Olympic and Paralympic Games.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The XXIII Olympic Winter Games will take place from February 9 through February 25, 2018, in PyeongChang, South Korea; and WHEREAS, The XII Paralympic Winter Games will take place from March 9 through March 18, 2018, in PyeongChang, South Korea; and WHEREAS, South Korea is hosting the Olympic Winter Games and Paralympic Winter Games for the first time; andWHEREAS, South Korea first hosted the Summer Olympic Games 30 years ago in 1988 with the successful XXIV Summer Olympics; andWHEREAS, Heightened political and military tension continues to exist on the Korean Peninsula due to the aggressive missile tests by the North Korean government; Peninsula; andWHEREAS, The Olympic spirit Spirit is intended to promote peace and harmony throughout the world through international sports; andWHEREAS, In the Olympic Spirit, South Korea and North Korea symbolically marched as one team at the opening ceremonies of the XXVII and XXVIII Olympic Games in 2000 and 2004 respectively, but competed separately; andWHEREAS, South Korea and North Korea plan to march under a united flag at the opening ceremonies of the Olympic Winter Games in 2018 and will compete together on their first joint Olympic team; andWHEREAS, PyeongChang, South Korea, is anticipated to host the largest number of participating countries in the history of the Olympic Winter Games; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the people of California and the Legislature strongly commend South Korea for hosting the XXIII Olympic Winter Games and the XII Paralympic Winter Games; and be it furtherResolved, That the people of California and the Legislature extend their best wishes to South Korea for a safe and successful Olympic Winter Games and Paralympic Winter Games; and be it furtherResolved, That North Koreas participation in the Olympic Winter Games is welcomed and will lay the foundation for peace and harmony between the two countries and eventually contribute to world peace; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the President of South Korea, the South Korean National Assembly, the North Korean government, the Winter Olympic Committee, the South Korean Winter Olympic Committee, the South Korean Consulate General offices in San Francisco and Los Angeles, local Korean community organizations in California, and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Amended IN  Assembly  January 23, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 157Introduced by Assembly Member ChoiJanuary 18, 2018Relative to the 2018 Olympic Winter Games and Paralympic Winter Games. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 157, as amended, Choi. Olympic Winter Games and Paralympic Winter Games in South Korea.This measure would commend South Korea for hosting the XXIII Olympic Winter Games and the XII Paralympic Winter Games and offer wishes for a safe and successful Olympic and Paralympic Games.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Amended IN  Assembly  January 23, 2018

Amended IN  Assembly  January 23, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 157

Introduced by Assembly Member ChoiJanuary 18, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Member Choi
January 18, 2018

Relative to the 2018 Olympic Winter Games and Paralympic Winter Games. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 157, as amended, Choi. Olympic Winter Games and Paralympic Winter Games in South Korea.

This measure would commend South Korea for hosting the XXIII Olympic Winter Games and the XII Paralympic Winter Games and offer wishes for a safe and successful Olympic and Paralympic Games.

This measure would commend South Korea for hosting the XXIII Olympic Winter Games and the XII Paralympic Winter Games and offer wishes for a safe and successful Olympic and Paralympic Games.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The XXIII Olympic Winter Games will take place from February 9 through February 25, 2018, in PyeongChang, South Korea; and 

WHEREAS, The XII Paralympic Winter Games will take place from March 9 through March 18, 2018, in PyeongChang, South Korea; and 

WHEREAS, South Korea is hosting the Olympic Winter Games and Paralympic Winter Games for the first time; and

WHEREAS, South Korea first hosted the Summer Olympic Games 30 years ago in 1988 with the successful XXIV Summer Olympics; and

WHEREAS, Heightened political and military tension continues to exist on the Korean Peninsula due to the aggressive missile tests by the North Korean government; Peninsula; and

WHEREAS, The Olympic spirit Spirit is intended to promote peace and harmony throughout the world through international sports; and

WHEREAS, In the Olympic Spirit, South Korea and North Korea symbolically marched as one team at the opening ceremonies of the XXVII and XXVIII Olympic Games in 2000 and 2004 respectively, but competed separately; and

WHEREAS, South Korea and North Korea plan to march under a united flag at the opening ceremonies of the Olympic Winter Games in 2018 and will compete together on their first joint Olympic team; and

WHEREAS, PyeongChang, South Korea, is anticipated to host the largest number of participating countries in the history of the Olympic Winter Games; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the people of California and the Legislature strongly commend South Korea for hosting the XXIII Olympic Winter Games and the XII Paralympic Winter Games; and be it further

Resolved, That the people of California and the Legislature extend their best wishes to South Korea for a safe and successful Olympic Winter Games and Paralympic Winter Games; and be it further

Resolved, That North Koreas participation in the Olympic Winter Games is welcomed and will lay the foundation for peace and harmony between the two countries and eventually contribute to world peace; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the President of South Korea, the South Korean National Assembly, the North Korean government, the Winter Olympic Committee, the South Korean Winter Olympic Committee, the South Korean Consulate General offices in San Francisco and Los Angeles, local Korean community organizations in California, and to the author for appropriate distribution.