Assembly | 09/07/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 213, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6039.) | ||
Senate | 08/28/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6670.) | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 23). | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2018 | Introduced. To print. |