1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 279 CHAPTER 213 Relative to plant-based diets. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 07, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 279, Kalra. Plant-based diets.This measure would encourage Californians to include more healthy plant-based foods in their diet.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The State of California has taken significant steps to establish policies and programs to preserve and protect its environment, combat climate change, provide for the health and well-being of all people, and show compassion to and support the humane treatment of animals; andWHEREAS, The current world population is 7.6 billion people, and is projected to grow by 1.1 percent a year, with estimates reaching 8.6 billion people in 2030 and 9.8 billion by 2050; andWHEREAS, California continues to lead the nation in adopting practices and policies to protect and preserve the environment and natural resources, and as the worlds population continues to grow, California should continue to demonstrate how the worlds population can reduce its impact on the environment; and WHEREAS, A growing amount of research has demonstrated the health, environmental, and humane benefits of a plant-based diet; andWHEREAS, Reports published by the National Institutes of Health, public health organizations, and colleges and universities have extolled the virtues and benefits of a plant-based diet and the benefits it presents medically, societally, and environmentally; andWHEREAS, A plant-based diet is a diet that emphasizes plant-based foods in a persons diet, making foods such as vegetables, fruits, legumes, beans, seeds, and whole grains the centerpiece of a meal; andWHEREAS, Plant-based diets have been proven to help lower cholesterol, increase the consumption of fiber and naturally occurring vitamins and minerals, and lower the risk of cancer, heart disease, diabetes, and other chronic health conditions; and WHEREAS, Increasing the consumption of plant-based foods helps and improves efforts to protect and preserve the environment by reducing the impact on greenhouse gas emissions, improving water conservation, and reducing habitat degradation and deforestation; andWHEREAS, Increased plant-based food production helps improve the worlds ability to meet future food supply demands; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That making plant-based foods the emphasis of ones diet has been proven to have a positive impact on the environment, individual health, and society as a whole, and all Californians are encouraged to include more plant-based foods in their diet; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled September 04, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 30, 2018 Passed IN Assembly August 27, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 279Introduced by Assembly Member Kalra(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Friedman)(Principal coauthor: Senator Lara)(Coauthor: Senator Beall)August 13, 2018 Relative to plant-based diets. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 279, Kalra. Plant-based diets.This measure would encourage Californians to include more healthy plant-based foods in their diet.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The State of California has taken significant steps to establish policies and programs to preserve and protect its environment, combat climate change, provide for the health and well-being of all people, and show compassion to and support the humane treatment of animals; andWHEREAS, The current world population is 7.6 billion people, and is projected to grow by 1.1 percent a year, with estimates reaching 8.6 billion people in 2030 and 9.8 billion by 2050; andWHEREAS, California continues to lead the nation in adopting practices and policies to protect and preserve the environment and natural resources, and as the worlds population continues to grow, California should continue to demonstrate how the worlds population can reduce its impact on the environment; and WHEREAS, A growing amount of research has demonstrated the health, environmental, and humane benefits of a plant-based diet; andWHEREAS, Reports published by the National Institutes of Health, public health organizations, and colleges and universities have extolled the virtues and benefits of a plant-based diet and the benefits it presents medically, societally, and environmentally; andWHEREAS, A plant-based diet is a diet that emphasizes plant-based foods in a persons diet, making foods such as vegetables, fruits, legumes, beans, seeds, and whole grains the centerpiece of a meal; andWHEREAS, Plant-based diets have been proven to help lower cholesterol, increase the consumption of fiber and naturally occurring vitamins and minerals, and lower the risk of cancer, heart disease, diabetes, and other chronic health conditions; and WHEREAS, Increasing the consumption of plant-based foods helps and improves efforts to protect and preserve the environment by reducing the impact on greenhouse gas emissions, improving water conservation, and reducing habitat degradation and deforestation; andWHEREAS, Increased plant-based food production helps improve the worlds ability to meet future food supply demands; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That making plant-based foods the emphasis of ones diet has been proven to have a positive impact on the environment, individual health, and society as a whole, and all Californians are encouraged to include more plant-based foods in their diet; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|