Assembly | 09/19/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 09/19/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2683.) | ||
Senate | 09/01/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 1). | ||
Senate | 07/10/2017 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2017 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 7. Page 1803.) | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 26). | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2017 | Introduced. To print. |