Assembly | 02/24/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 7, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 221.) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 235.) | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 19). | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2017 | Introduced. To print. |