1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 4 CHAPTER 7Relative to the Lunar New Year Celebration. [ Filed with Secretary of State February 24, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 4, Ting. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year Celebration.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, January 28, 2017, marks the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including the United States, and especially California; andWHEREAS, California is home to nearly 6 million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; andWHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American community has contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by over 2.5 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; andWHEREAS, This Lunar New Year is the Year of the Rooster and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties, and to start the new year with a clean slate; andWHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Members join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating January 28, 2017, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year, the Year of the Rooster, and extend best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the authors for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled February 21, 2017 Passed IN Senate February 17, 2017 Passed IN Assembly January 30, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 4Introduced by Assembly Member Ting(Coauthors: Assembly Members Bonta, Chau, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Fong, Gloria, Kalra, Low, Muratsuchi, Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Travis Allen, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Cervantes, Chvez, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)(Coauthors: Senators Nguyen and Pan)January 04, 2017Relative to the Lunar New Year Celebration. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 4, Ting. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year Celebration.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, January 28, 2017, marks the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including the United States, and especially California; andWHEREAS, California is home to nearly 6 million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; andWHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American community has contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by over 2.5 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; andWHEREAS, This Lunar New Year is the Year of the Rooster and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties, and to start the new year with a clean slate; andWHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Members join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating January 28, 2017, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year, the Year of the Rooster, and extend best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the authors for appropriate distribution. |
---|