Assembly | 06/06/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1225.) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1420.) | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Introduced. To print. |