1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 69 CHAPTER 61Relative to Compost Awareness Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 06, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 69, Arambula. Compost Awareness Week.This measure would designate the week of May 7, 2017, through May 13, 2017, as Compost Awareness Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Composting is an effective form of waste reduction, reuse, and recycling, and since organic materials make up approximately 30 percent of the material going to landfills, composting is becoming one of the primary methods communities use to reach waste diversion goals and create sustainable communities; andWHEREAS, Chapter 719 of the Statutes of 2014 phased out diversion credits for organic alternative daily cover in landfills, Chapter 727 of the Statutes of 2014 statutorily mandated commercial recycling of organics, and Chapter 593 of the Statutes of 2015 required organic waste recycling planning by local jurisdictions; andWHEREAS, Section 42649.87 of the Public Resources Code requires the California Environmental Protection Agency, in coordination with the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, the State Water Resources Control Board, the State Air Resources Board, and the Department of Food and Agriculture, to develop and implement policies to aid in diverting organic waste from landfills by promoting the use of agricultural, forestry, and urban organic waste as a feedstock for compost and by promoting the appropriate use of that compost throughout the state; andWHEREAS, Materials, including yard trimmings, vegetable cuttings, biosolids, food scraps, manures, and hay shavings, have been composted and converted into a beneficial product known as compost; and WHEREAS, Returning organic resources to the soil reduces water consumption by over 30 percent on all soil types, conserves water during extreme drought or flooding conditions, decreases dependence on chemical fertilizers and pesticides, and decreases erosion and nonpoint source pollution; andWHEREAS, Composting is recognized by the State Air Resources Board as an important tool to sequester massive amounts of carbon in Californias soils to help immediately reverse global warming; andWHEREAS, Communities, through their local governments, highway departments, soil conservation services, and public works professionals, can have significant impacts on clean water, soil, climate change, and landfill diversion by using compost for public works projects; andWHEREAS, International Compost Awareness Week is a multimedia publicity and educational initiative to showcase compost production and demonstrate compost use; andWHEREAS, Composting creates green jobs and infrastructure for cities and states that implement composting programs; andWHEREAS, The United States Composting Council, Canada, and the United Kingdom have declared the first week of May to be the annual International Compost Awareness Week; andWHEREAS, The Association of Compost Producers is the California State Chapter of the United States Composting Council and manages International Compost Awareness Week in California; andWHEREAS, The theme of 2017, Compost! Healthy Soil, Healthy Food, is a great way to get the message out regarding compost and its many benefits to communities and property owners; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the week of May 7, 2017, through May 13, 2017, is hereby designated as Compost Awareness Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 30, 2017 Passed IN Senate May 26, 2017 Passed IN Assembly May 08, 2017 Amended IN Assembly April 26, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 69Introduced by Assembly Member Arambula(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Travis Allen, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Bonta, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gomez, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mayes, McCarty, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)April 20, 2017Relative to Compost Awareness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 69, Arambula. Compost Awareness Week.This measure would designate the week of May 7, 2017, through May 13, 2017, as Compost Awareness Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Composting is an effective form of waste reduction, reuse, and recycling, and since organic materials make up approximately 30 percent of the material going to landfills, composting is becoming one of the primary methods communities use to reach waste diversion goals and create sustainable communities; andWHEREAS, Chapter 719 of the Statutes of 2014 phased out diversion credits for organic alternative daily cover in landfills, Chapter 727 of the Statutes of 2014 statutorily mandated commercial recycling of organics, and Chapter 593 of the Statutes of 2015 required organic waste recycling planning by local jurisdictions; andWHEREAS, Section 42649.87 of the Public Resources Code requires the California Environmental Protection Agency, in coordination with the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, the State Water Resources Control Board, the State Air Resources Board, and the Department of Food and Agriculture, to develop and implement policies to aid in diverting organic waste from landfills by promoting the use of agricultural, forestry, and urban organic waste as a feedstock for compost and by promoting the appropriate use of that compost throughout the state; andWHEREAS, Materials, including yard trimmings, vegetable cuttings, biosolids, food scraps, manures, and hay shavings, have been composted and converted into a beneficial product known as compost; and WHEREAS, Returning organic resources to the soil reduces water consumption by over 30 percent on all soil types, conserves water during extreme drought or flooding conditions, decreases dependence on chemical fertilizers and pesticides, and decreases erosion and nonpoint source pollution; andWHEREAS, Composting is recognized by the State Air Resources Board as an important tool to sequester massive amounts of carbon in Californias soils to help immediately reverse global warming; andWHEREAS, Communities, through their local governments, highway departments, soil conservation services, and public works professionals, can have significant impacts on clean water, soil, climate change, and landfill diversion by using compost for public works projects; andWHEREAS, International Compost Awareness Week is a multimedia publicity and educational initiative to showcase compost production and demonstrate compost use; andWHEREAS, Composting creates green jobs and infrastructure for cities and states that implement composting programs; andWHEREAS, The United States Composting Council, Canada, and the United Kingdom have declared the first week of May to be the annual International Compost Awareness Week; andWHEREAS, The Association of Compost Producers is the California State Chapter of the United States Composting Council and manages International Compost Awareness Week in California; andWHEREAS, The theme of 2017, Compost! Healthy Soil, Healthy Food, is a great way to get the message out regarding compost and its many benefits to communities and property owners; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the week of May 7, 2017, through May 13, 2017, is hereby designated as Compost Awareness Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|