California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR76 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 25, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2017

Chaptered

Bill August 31, 2017

Amended

Bill June 27, 2017
Bill May 10, 2017