Assembly | 09/07/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2344.) | ||
Senate | 08/23/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/18/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/17/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2572.) | ||
Assembly | 07/17/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2017 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 07/12/2017 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 11). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2017 | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2017 | Introduced. To print. |