California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR8 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2017

Amended

Bill July 13, 2017
Bill May 1, 2017