Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2349.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2401.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|