California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR13 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 25, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2017

Amended

Bill June 27, 2017
Bill June 12, 2017