Senate | 08/06/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/05/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 6101.) | ||
Assembly | 07/05/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2018 | Introduced. To print. |