1 | | - | Amended IN Assembly June 28, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Joint Resolution No. 45Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-Silva(Coauthor: Assembly Member Travis Allen)(Coauthor: Senator Bates)June 21, 2018Relative to the 68th anniversary of the Korean War. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAJR 45, as amended, Choi. Korean War: 68th anniversary: peace talks.This measure would, among other things, mark June 25, 2018, as the 68th anniversary of the Korean War and encourage participants in specified discussions regarding North and South Korea to have a sincere intention of achieving peace in the region.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The year 2018 marks the 68th anniversary of the Korean War, which began on June 25, 1950, with the invasion by communist forces led by Kim Il Sung; andWHEREAS, The Korean War not only devastated the country of Korea but also significantly and negatively impacted many countries of the world, particularly including the United States of America; andWHEREAS, The Korean Peninsula is still the way it was in 1953, with the Demilitarized Zone being guarded by artillery and patrolled by troops; andWHEREAS, Korea remains the only country in the world is still divided by north and south; into North and South since the Korean Armistice was signed on July 27, 1953, in Panmunjom; andWHEREAS, This decades-long conflict has split families and continues to have a devastating impact on the people of Korea; andWHEREAS, The division of the Korean Peninsula separated more than 10 million Korean family members, including some who are now citizens of the United States; andWHEREAS, According to the 2010 United States census and with current estimates, there are roughly 750,000 people in California who self-identify as Korean in origin, making California the state with the largest Korean population; andWHEREAS, Approximately 150,000 United States citizens reside in South Korea; andWHEREAS, On April 27, 2018, history was made when South Korean President Moon Jae-in and North Korean leader Kim Jong Un crossed over the Korean Demilitarized zonemarking the first time that leaders of the two nations have done soand sat down together to discuss relations between the two countries; andWHEREAS, The American June 12, 2018, summit with between the leaders of the United States and North Korea on June 12, 2018, moved the peace talks forward; has created an opening for further discussions between the two nations; andWHEREAS, At this meeting, both sides signed a document in which North Korea agreed to work towards the complete denuclearization of North Korea; the Korean Peninsula; andWHEREAS, The prospect of peace and prosperity in the region has been far too long a distant dream for so many who call Korea home; andWHEREAS, These events represent a source of great hope for the Korean people and the world at large on this occasion of the 68th anniversary of the Korean War; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly and the Senate of the State of California, jointly, That the members of the Assembly and the Senate join the Korean American communities throughout the state in marking June 25, 2018, as the 68th anniversary of the Korean War; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature respectfully calls upon the President and Congress of the United States, as well as all sides in these discussions, to continue coming to the table with the sincere intention of achieving peace in the region, and to take appropriate measures to facilitate stability in the Korean region; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature shares in the hopes of the 750,000 Californians of Korean origin for the continued success of all future meetings; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the President of the United States, to the Speaker of the House of Representatives, to the Majority Leader of the Senate, to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States, and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Joint Resolution No. 45Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-Silva(Coauthor: Assembly Member Travis Allen)(Coauthor: Senator Bates)June 21, 2018 Relative to the 68th anniversary of the Korean War. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAJR 45, as introduced, Choi. Korean War: 68th anniversary: peace talks.This measure would, among other things, mark June 25, 2018, as the 68th anniversary of the Korean War and encourage participants in specified discussions regarding North and South Korea to have a sincere intention of achieving peace in the region.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The year 2018 marks the 68th anniversary of the Korean War, which began on June 25, 1950, with the invasion by communist forces led by Kim Il Sung; andWHEREAS, The Korean War not only devastated the country of Korea but also significantly and negatively impacted many countries of the world, particularly the United States of America; andWHEREAS, The Korean Peninsula is still the way it was in 1953, with the Demilitarized Zone being guarded by artillery and patrolled by troops; andWHEREAS, Korea remains the only country in the world still divided by north and south; andWHEREAS, This decades-long conflict has split families and continues to have a devastating impact on the people of Korea; andWHEREAS, The division of the Korean Peninsula separated more than 10 million Korean family members, including some who are now citizens of the United States; andWHEREAS, According to the 2010 United States census and with current estimates, there are roughly 750,000 people in California who self-identify as Korean in origin, making California the state with the largest Korean population; andWHEREAS, Approximately 150,000 United States citizens reside in South Korea; andWHEREAS, On April 27, 2018, history was made when South Korean President Moon Jae-in and North Korean leader Kim Jong Un crossed over the Korean Demilitarized zonemarking the first time that leaders of the two nations have done soand sat down together to discuss relations between the two countries; andWHEREAS, The American summit with North Korea on June 12, 2018, moved the peace talks forward; andWHEREAS, At this meeting, both sides signed a document in which North Korea agreed to the complete denuclearization of North Korea; andWHEREAS, The prospect of peace and prosperity in the region has been far too long a distant dream for so many who call Korea home; andWHEREAS, These events represent a source of great hope for the Korean people and the world at large on this occasion of the 68th anniversary of the Korean War; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly and the Senate of the State of California, jointly, That the members of the Assembly and the Senate join the Korean American communities throughout the state in marking June 25, 2018, as the 68th anniversary of the Korean War; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature respectfully calls upon the President and Congress of the United States, as well as all sides in these discussions, to continue coming to the table with the sincere intention of achieving peace in the region, and to take appropriate measures to facilitate stability in the Korean region; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature shares in the hopes of the 750,000 Californians of Korean origin for the continued success of all future meetings; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|