Assembly | 08/09/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Page 6214.). | ||
Assembly | 08/09/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 6). | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2018 | Introduced. |