LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR12
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR12
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR12
Action History
Assembly
05/18/2017
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1620.).
Assembly
05/11/2017
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 10).
Assembly
05/04/2017
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Assembly
05/03/2017
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Amended.
Assembly
04/27/2017
Referred to Com. on ED.
Assembly
01/30/2017
Introduced.