California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR12 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 05/03/2017

                            Amended IN  Assembly  May 03, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  May 01, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 12Introduced by Assembly Member GomezJanuary 30, 2017Relative to voter education.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 12, as amended, Gomez. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, It is currently required that voter education information, including the importance of registering to vote, how to register to vote, and the requirements to qualify as eligible to register to vote, be included in the American government and civics curriculum at the high school level; andWHEREAS, Many high school pupils have not taken advantage of voter preregistration, in which eligible 16-year-old and 17-year-old Californians are encouraged to participate; andWHEREAS, Voting among Californias youth is strikingly lower than in voting by other age groups, as the 18 to 29, inclusive, age group made up 21.2 percent of the eligible voting population in 2012, yet made up a mere 15.4 percent of voters, compared to the group aged 65 years of age and older, who made up 19.1 percent of the eligible voting population in 2012, yet they constituted 22.3 percent of those who cast ballots; andWHEREAS, A healthy democracy requires a diverse amalgamation of voices and opinions in pursuit of governing with the consent of a plurality that better represents a constituency as diverse as that which exists in the Golden State of California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That, during the next revision of the history-social science curriculum framework after January 1, 2018, the Assembly requests the Instructional Quality Commission to consider including content on the importance of preregistering to vote in local, state, and federal elections, how to preregister to vote, both online and by mail, and the requirements for preregistering to vote, as appropriate, in that framework; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Amended IN  Assembly  May 03, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  May 01, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 12Introduced by Assembly Member GomezJanuary 30, 2017Relative to voter education.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 12, as amended, Gomez. Digest Key

 Amended IN  Assembly  May 03, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  May 01, 2017

Amended IN  Assembly  May 03, 2017
Amended IN  Assembly  May 01, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

House Resolution No. 12

Introduced by Assembly Member GomezJanuary 30, 2017

Introduced by Assembly Member Gomez
January 30, 2017

Relative to voter education.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

HR 12, as amended, Gomez. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, It is currently required that voter education information, including the importance of registering to vote, how to register to vote, and the requirements to qualify as eligible to register to vote, be included in the American government and civics curriculum at the high school level; and

WHEREAS, Many high school pupils have not taken advantage of voter preregistration, in which eligible 16-year-old and 17-year-old Californians are encouraged to participate; and

WHEREAS, Voting among Californias youth is strikingly lower than in voting by other age groups, as the 18 to 29, inclusive, age group made up 21.2 percent of the eligible voting population in 2012, yet made up a mere 15.4 percent of voters, compared to the group aged 65 years of age and older, who made up 19.1 percent of the eligible voting population in 2012, yet they constituted 22.3 percent of those who cast ballots; and

WHEREAS, A healthy democracy requires a diverse amalgamation of voices and opinions in pursuit of governing with the consent of a plurality that better represents a constituency as diverse as that which exists in the Golden State of California; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That, during the next revision of the history-social science curriculum framework after January 1, 2018, the Assembly requests the Instructional Quality Commission to consider including content on the importance of preregistering to vote in local, state, and federal elections, how to preregister to vote, both online and by mail, and the requirements for preregistering to vote, as appropriate, in that framework; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.