Assembly | 02/26/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Page 4093.). | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2018 | Measure version as amended on February 16 corrected. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2018 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 13). | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2018 | Introduced. |