California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR69 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 02/16/2018

                            Amended IN  Assembly  February 16, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 69Introduced by Assembly Members Carrillo and SantiagoJanuary 11, 2018Relative to immigration. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 69, as amended, Carrillo. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, On January 8, 2018, the Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security announced the termination of the Temporary Protected Status (TPS) designation for El Salvador and that the designation will terminate on September 9, 2019; andWHEREAS, The termination of the TPS designation will impact about 200,000 immigrants from El Salvador since the original TPS designation for El Salvador was established in 2001; and WHEREAS, There are approximately 49,000 TPS holders from El Salvador who reside in California; andWHEREAS, The TPS program was established by the United States congress Congress in 1990 to provide protection to foreign nationals and work authorization while they remain in the United States because they cannot return safely to their countries due to armed conflict, environmental disasters or epidemics, or other extraordinary conditions; andWHEREAS, The extension for the TPS program that was approved by the United States Department of Homeland Security in 2016, which was for the period of September 10, 2016, through March 9, 2018, had cited the following reasons for the extension: a series of natural disasters and environmental challenges, including regional drought, that has impacted food security; infrastructure challenges, including a housing deficit of about 630,000 houses and a lack of potable water and electricity; increasing criminal violence and insecurity; and economic challenges such as high unemployment and poverty; andWHEREAS, TPS holders from El Salvador contribute annually about $3.1 billion in gross domestic product and experience a high labor force participation rate of 88 percent; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly urges the President of the United States to reverse his decision to terminate the TPS designation for El Salvador; and be it furtherRESOLVED, That the Assembly urges the President and the Congress of the United States to create a legislative solution to establish permanent legal status for Salvadorans who were granted temporary protected status; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the President and Vice President of the United States, to the Speaker of the House of Representatives, to the Majority Leader of the Senate, and to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States, and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Amended IN  Assembly  February 16, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 69Introduced by Assembly Members Carrillo and SantiagoJanuary 11, 2018Relative to immigration. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 69, as amended, Carrillo. Digest Key

 Amended IN  Assembly  February 16, 2018

Amended IN  Assembly  February 16, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

House Resolution No. 69

Introduced by Assembly Members Carrillo and SantiagoJanuary 11, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Members Carrillo and Santiago
January 11, 2018

Relative to immigration. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

HR 69, as amended, Carrillo. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, On January 8, 2018, the Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security announced the termination of the Temporary Protected Status (TPS) designation for El Salvador and that the designation will terminate on September 9, 2019; and

WHEREAS, The termination of the TPS designation will impact about 200,000 immigrants from El Salvador since the original TPS designation for El Salvador was established in 2001; and 

WHEREAS, There are approximately 49,000 TPS holders from El Salvador who reside in California; and

WHEREAS, The TPS program was established by the United States congress Congress in 1990 to provide protection to foreign nationals and work authorization while they remain in the United States because they cannot return safely to their countries due to armed conflict, environmental disasters or epidemics, or other extraordinary conditions; and

WHEREAS, The extension for the TPS program that was approved by the United States Department of Homeland Security in 2016, which was for the period of September 10, 2016, through March 9, 2018, had cited the following reasons for the extension: a series of natural disasters and environmental challenges, including regional drought, that has impacted food security; infrastructure challenges, including a housing deficit of about 630,000 houses and a lack of potable water and electricity; increasing criminal violence and insecurity; and economic challenges such as high unemployment and poverty; and

WHEREAS, TPS holders from El Salvador contribute annually about $3.1 billion in gross domestic product and experience a high labor force participation rate of 88 percent; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly urges the President of the United States to reverse his decision to terminate the TPS designation for El Salvador; and be it further

RESOLVED, That the Assembly urges the President and the Congress of the United States to create a legislative solution to establish permanent legal status for Salvadorans who were granted temporary protected status; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the President and Vice President of the United States, to the Speaker of the House of Representatives, to the Majority Leader of the Senate, and to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States, and to the author for appropriate distribution.