|
09/10/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 312, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5966.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 33. Page 6733.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
September 11 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
August 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2017
|
July 5 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 1306.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1177.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 1005.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|