California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB100 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2018

Amended

Bill August 20, 2018
Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 27, 2018
Bill September 11, 2017
Bill September 8, 2017
Bill July 18, 2017
Bill June 26, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill May 17, 2017
Bill May 1, 2017