|
09/13/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 376, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6126.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 6954.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4763.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4625.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2018
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4418.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2018
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|