California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1016 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2018

Amended

Bill August 20, 2018
Bill June 28, 2018
Bill April 17, 2018
Bill March 21, 2018