California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1022 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2018

Amended

Bill April 12, 2018
Bill March 14, 2018