|
07/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5027.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5966.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4762.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2018
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4625.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|