California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1053 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2018

Enrolled

Bill July 9, 2018

Chaptered

Bill July 20, 2018

Amended

Bill May 24, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018