Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 4407.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
(Corrected May 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4303.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
May 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 4785.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 4718.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|