California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1088 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2018

Amended

Bill July 3, 2018
Bill June 12, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill May 2, 2018
Bill April 9, 2018
Bill March 15, 2018